MA H4745 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4996

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide hazard pay for essential workers in the COVID-19 emergency. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing hazard pay for essential workers in the COVID-19 emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4996
2020-06-08JointHearing scheduled for 06/12/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony
2020-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-27HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-04-23HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4996 (Replaced by) 2020-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback