MA H4778 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Reported by H4820
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House bill No. 4768, as changed by the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voting options in response to COVID-19

Sponsors

House House Committee on Ways and Means CommitteeHouse Committee on Election Laws CommitteeRep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. James Welch [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #199 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseReported by H4820
2020-06-18SenateCommittee of conference appointed (Finegold-Creem-Fattman), in concurrence
2020-06-18SenateSenate insisted on its amendment
2020-06-18SenateRules suspended
2020-06-18HouseCommittee of conference appointed - (Lawn-M. Moran-Hill)
2020-06-18HouseHouse NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
2020-06-18HouseRules suspended
2020-06-16SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #199 (Yeas 40 - Nays 0)
2020-06-16SenateReprinted as amended, see S2764
2020-06-16SenateRead third
2020-06-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-06-16SenateAmendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
2020-06-16SenateRead second
2020-06-16SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2755
2020-06-09SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2020-06-08SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-06-04HousePassed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 184)
2020-06-04HouseH4768, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H4768 (Replaces) 2020-06-04 - Published as amended, see H4778
S2764 (Replaces) 2020-06-16 - See H4778
H4820 (Replaces) 2020-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback