MA H4818 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4448

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce racial inequities in maternal health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce racial inequities in maternal health

Sponsors

House House Committee on Ways and Means CommitteeHouse Joint Committee on Public Health CommitteeRep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #265 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 190 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-07-30SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #265 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0)
2020-07-30SenateRead third
2020-07-30SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-07-30SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2865
2020-07-30SenateRead second
2020-07-30SenateRules suspended
2020-07-30SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2865
2020-07-27SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2020-06-30HousePassed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 190)
2020-06-30HouseRead third, amended
2020-06-29HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-06-29HouseNew draft of H4448
2020-06-29HousePending new draft of H4448
2020-06-29HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4448 (Replaces) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4818

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback