MA H5083 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-23 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-23 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to polling place security and integrity. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to polling place security and integrity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-10-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2020-09-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5083 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5083.pdf |