MA H587 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4333
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require written notice of medical tests outside a patient’s network for insurance purposes. Financial Services.
Title
To require written notice of medical tests outside a patient’s network for insurance purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Michael Day [D] |
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4333 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H497 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4333 (Replaced by) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
H497 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4333 (Replaced by) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H587 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H587.pdf |