MA H657 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that polling places are accessible to handicapped and elderly voters. Election Laws.
Title
Assuring that polling places are accessible to elderly and physically challenged voters
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1911 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H657.pdf |