MA H775 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4171
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting cities and towns from fees from the Massachusetts Oil and Hazardous Material Release Prevention and Response Act. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Exempting towns from certain fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4171 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4171 (Replaced by) 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H822 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1137 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
S118 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2144
S287 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
H2089 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1113 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1097 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
H822 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1137 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
S118 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2144
S287 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
H2089 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1113 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1097 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H775 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H775.pdf |