MA H896 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Quabbin Watershed Advisory Committee. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to the Quabbin Watershed Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S555 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S505 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S2467 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
S2522 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4479 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S2467 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
S2522 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4479 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H896.pdf |