MA H916 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assess the future of mattress recycling. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To assess the future of mattress recycling in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Simon Cataldo [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S513 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - House concurred
S512 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - House concurred
H881 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
S512 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - House concurred
H881 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H916.pdf |