MA S512 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mattress recycling. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to mattress recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S512 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S512.pdf |