MA S1 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the general concerns of the Commonwealth.
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor relative to the general concerns of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Senate | Placed on file |
Same As/Similar To
S2 (Similar To) 2015-01-07 - Placed on file
S1965 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2000 (Similar To) 2015-08-24 - Referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2007 (Similar To) 2015-09-03 - See S1951
S1965 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2000 (Similar To) 2015-08-24 - Referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2007 (Similar To) 2015-09-03 - See S1951
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1.pdf |