MA S103 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to persons with developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to persons with developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2434 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
S2456 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4393 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2456 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4393 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S103.pdf |