MA S1107 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify employer sanctions for improper expenditure of withholdings or deductions from wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To clarify employer sanctions for improper expenditure of withholdings or deductions from wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass under (Joint Rule 10) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1681 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1681 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1107.pdf |