MA S1128 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to medical marijuana patient safety and access. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to medical marijuana patient safety and access
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2639 |
2019-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H3597 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3646 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3647 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3539 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4523
S2639 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3597 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3646 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3647 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3539 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4523
S2639 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1128.pdf |