MA S119 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect individuals with disabilities in MassHealth day habilitation programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To update Nicky's Law to protect individuals with disabilities in MassHealth day habilitation programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2799 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2800 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4106 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4162 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2800 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4106 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4162 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S119 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S119.pdf |