MA S121 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update the alcohol excise tax. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To update the alcohol excise tax
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
H28 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2603 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2599 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H28 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2603 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2599 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S121.pdf |