MA S1714 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the fair taxation of alcoholic beverages. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the fair taxation of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2539 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
H2660 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S121 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
H2660 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S121 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1714 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1714.pdf |