MA S121 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Moran, a petition of Susan L. Moran, James B. Eldridge, Carmine Lawrence Gentile and Jacob R. Oliveira that provisions be made to revive and continue the non-emergency human services transportation task force. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolve reviving and continuing the non-emergency human services transportation task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S475 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2004 (Similar To) 2023-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H783 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4406 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2004 (Similar To) 2023-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H783 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4406 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S121.pdf |