MA S124 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance child welfare protections. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Enhancing child welfare protections
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H165 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2382 (Similar To) 2023-04-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2383
S2383 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2023
S2382 (Similar To) 2023-04-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2383
S2383 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S124 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S124.pdf |