MA S1299 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enable cities and towns to stabilize rents and protect tenants. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Enabling cities and towns to stabilize rents and protect tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-30 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S892 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S872 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1304 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S872 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1304 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1299.pdf |