MA S1300 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to regional lock-up facilities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to regional lock-up facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1551 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1141 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S977 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1110 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2018
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
H652 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1551 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1141 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S977 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1110 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2018
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
H652 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1300.pdf |