MA S1356 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to governing not for profit hospital system or service operating an ambulance service. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governing not for profit hospital system or service operating an ambulance service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2547
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1172 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1144 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1150 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1184 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S1416 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H1927 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback