MA S1342 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate hospitals. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further regulating hospitals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2547
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1503 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H1139 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
H1378 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1927 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback