MA S1372 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3611
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access to blood donation. Public Health.
Title
To increase access to blood donation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H3611 |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2139 (Similar To) 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3611 (Replaces) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied S1372
H3611 (Replaces) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied S1372
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1372 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1372.pdf |