MA S1703 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to increase the local tax rate on meals. Revenue.
Title
To authorize cities and towns to increase the local tax rate on meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2508 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2653 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1729 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2547 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2475 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2489 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2653 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1729 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2547 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2475 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2489 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1703 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1703.pdf |