MA S1888 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support workforce and affordable housing. Revenue.
Title
Supporting workforce and affordable housing
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S895 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2702 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2702 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1888.pdf |