MA S2702 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to affordable housing trust fund of the town of West Tisbury. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to affordable housing trust fund of the town of West Tisbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-18 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1295 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1295 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2702 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2702.pdf |