MA S1917 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the taxation of above ground conduits, wires, and pipes used in the transportation of natural gas. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the taxation of above ground conduits, wires, and pipes used in the transportation of natural gas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2787 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4575 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4575 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1917 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1917.pdf |