MA S1954 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to employee recruitment and retention. Revenue.
Title
Relative to employee recruitment and retention
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4060 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4259 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
H4258 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4259 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
H4258 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1954 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1954.pdf |