MA S2010 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain land in the town of Brookfield. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain land in the town of Brookfield
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Similar To) 2023-11-14 - New draft (Rodrigues) substituted, see S2503
H4120 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4117 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4447 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4523 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4120 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4117 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4447 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4523 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2010.pdf |