MA S2029 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote gender and racial diversity on public boards and commissions. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote gender and racial diversity on public boards and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1006 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S577 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H1528 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1371 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2513 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S577 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H1528 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1371 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2513 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2029 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2029.pdf |