MA S2128 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure benefits through enhanced Selective Service registration. Transportation.
Title
To ensure benefits through enhanced Selective Service registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2164 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2128.pdf |