MA S2157 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repurpose the commonwealth's power plants to a clean energy future. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Repurposing the commonwealth's power plants to a clean energy future
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2117 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H3150 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H3696 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H3950 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4439 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3150 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H3696 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H3950 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4439 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2157.pdf |