MA S2338 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tax abatements for disabled veterans and Gold Star families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to tax abatements for disabled veterans and Gold Star families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3509 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4262 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2024
H4560 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Senate concurred
H3509 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4262 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2024
H4560 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2338 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2338.pdf |