MA S2365 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4135
Note: Replaces legislation S2412
Note: Replaces legislation S2412
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Reported by S2412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Reported by S2412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to educational opportunity for students
Title
Relative to educational opportunity for students
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 121 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House on adoption of amendment #36 Yea and Nay No. 118 (Y: 7 N: 147 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-23 - House - House on adoption of amendment #36 Yea and Nay No. 118 (Y: 7 N: 147 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported by S2412 |
2019-10-28 | House | Committee on conference appointed, in concurrence - (Peisch-Tucker-Ferguson) |
2019-10-28 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Committee on conference appointed (Lewis-Rodrigues-O'Connor) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-23 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 121) |
2019-10-23 | House | For actions, see H4137 |
2019-10-23 | House | Read third |
2019-10-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered H4137 |
2019-10-21 | House | Order adopted, see H4135 |
2019-10-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-07 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #107 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS] |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Text of S2350, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4135 (Replaced by) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Replaces) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Replaces) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2365 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2365.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj10232019_RollCalls.pdf |