MA S2412 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of New Bedford to grant a utility easement to the University of Massachusetts Dartmouth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of New Bedford to grant a utility easement to the University of Massachusetts Dartmouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-29 | House | House concurred |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3935 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2412 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2412.pdf |