MA S2415 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Elliot Brown, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Elliot Brown, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-01-09 | House | Enacted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-01-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read |
2019-11-19 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2019
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H4250 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H4250 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2415 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2415.pdf |