MA S2533 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S466
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote conservation through oyster shell recycling, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2533).
Title
To promote conservation through oyster shell recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-12-26 | Senate | New draft of S466 |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S466 (Replaces) 2023-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2533
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4182 (Similar To) 2023-11-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4182 (Similar To) 2023-11-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2533 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2533.pdf |