MA S2589 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S338
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the inclusion of American Sign Language in the Commonwealth’s public schools, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2589)
Title
To promote the inclusion of American Sign Language in the Commonwealth’s public schools
Sponsors
House Committee on Education | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-02-14 | Senate | New draft of S338 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S338 (Replaces) 2024-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2589
H466 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
S1482 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H4428 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H466 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4428
S1482 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H4428 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2589 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2589.pdf |