MA S2598 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S905
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to enhance the lives of survivors of human trafficking,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2598).
Title
To strengthen laws combatting human trafficking and protecting survivors of modern-day slavery
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-19 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #458 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-19 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-19 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #458 (Yeas 37 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Montigny) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gobi) adopted -see Roll Call #457 (Yeas 37 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read second |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 19, 2018 |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-07-12 | Senate | New draft of S905 and S906 |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S905 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S2599 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1680 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S2621 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2599 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1680 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S2621 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken