MA S2623 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Creem, a petition of Cynthia Stone Creem (by vote of the town) to authorize the town of Brookline to implement rent stabilization and tenant eviction protections. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Brookline to implement rent stabilization and tenant eviction protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-02-12 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H3744 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1318 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S1299 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2103 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S872 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1318 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S1299 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2103 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S872 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2623 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2623.pdf |