MA S263 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to student sex education. Education.
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2399 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3041 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S237 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S327 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S246 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S309 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H438 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2399 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S237 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S327 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S246 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S309 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H438 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2399 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S263.pdf |