MA S2678 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S829
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to establish a behavioral health workforce center of excellence at a state or community college, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2678).
Title
Establishing a behavioral health workforce center of excellence.
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Higher Education | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-01 | Senate | New draft of S829 and H1275 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S829 (Replaces) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2678 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2678.pdf |