MA S2691 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the continued employment of Jerry Shampang as an environmental police officer in the executive office of energy and environmental affairs
Title
Authorizing the continued employment of Jerry Shampang as an environmental police officer in the executive office of energy and environmental affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-03-18 | House | Enacted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-03-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-06 | House | Ordered to the third reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2024-03-06 | House | Read second |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2024-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting the text of an amendment, see H4461 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2464 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2464 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
H4196 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2024
H4195 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2024
H4197 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2024
H4461 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Adopted
H4196 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2024
H4195 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2024
H4197 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2024
H4461 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2691 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2691.pdf |