MA S39 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report accepted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report accepted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules of the Senate and House of Representatives for the 192nd General Court for the 2021-2022 legislative sessions, insomuch as relates to “portions of Joint Rule 1” and 1F
Title
Joint Rules of the Senate and House of Representatives for the 192nd General Court for the 2021-2022 legislative sessions, insomuch as relates to “portions of Joint Rule 1” and 1F
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Report accepted, in concurrence |
2021-03-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report accepted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported on a part of S14 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
S11 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S14
S14 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
S14 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S39 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S39.pdf |