MA S440 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H893 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H2881 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H759 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S452 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H803 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H723 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S532 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H615 (Similar To) 2019-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4227
H895 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2881 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H759 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S452 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H803 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H723 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S532 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H615 (Similar To) 2019-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4227
H895 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S440 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S440.pdf |