MA S456 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate hydraulic fracturing. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To regulate hydraulic fracturing
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Accompanied S522 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S522 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H2899 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2878 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1753 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1754 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1969 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2909 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4008
H785 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H2899 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2878 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1753 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1754 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1969 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2909 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4008
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S456 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S456.pdf |