MA S462 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2540

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to plastic bag reduction. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing plastic bag pollution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2540
2019-03-26JointHearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback