MA S66 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts foster care review office. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts foster care review office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2433 (Similar To) 2023-08-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S66 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S66.pdf |