MA S723 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1191
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to hospital bad debts, claim denials and prompt payments. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to hospital bad debts, claim denials and prompt payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied H1191 |
2023-08-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1403 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
H1175 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4620
H1187 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1924 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1191 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4566 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1175 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4620
H1187 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1924 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1191 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4566 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S723 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S723.pdf |